MS SB2470 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Move The Back-to-school Sales Tax Holiday From The Last Friday In July To The Second Friday In July, And To Extend It By One Day; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; move the back-to-school sales tax holiday to the second Friday in July.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-03 | House | Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |