MS SB2469 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-9-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete Any Prohibition Against Carrying A Concealed Weapon Into Certain Places Or In Certain Situations By A Person Holding A Concealed Weapon Permit; To Amend Sections 45-9-53 And 97-37-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Concealed weapons; remove prohibition against carrying in certain places.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2011-02-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-01-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |