MS SB2468 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Assault Upon Any Member Of The Mississippi National Guard Or United States Armed Forces Is An Aggravating Circumstance For Simple And Aggravated Assault; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Simple and aggravated assault; assault on member of military is aggravating circumstances for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Rogers (61st), Henley) |
2016-03-25 | House | Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Military Affairs |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |