MS SB2444 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 47-5-539 And 47-5-579, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize And Direct The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Expand The Pilot Work Initiative Under The Mississippi Prison Industries Corporation At Central Mississippi Correctional Facility To Any State, Regional And Private Correctional Facility In The State Of Mississippi Which House Inmates Under The Jurisdiction Of The Mississippi Department Of Corrections; To Prescribe Certain Conditions For The Operation Of The Mississippi Prison Industries Program; To Earmark Payments From The Inmate's Work Release Account For Authorized Purposes; To Delete The Automatic Repealer On The Prison Industries Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Central Mississippi Pilot Prison Industries program; expand to all state, regional and private correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: CN To AP |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Corrections;Appropriations A |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 5 | 539 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 579 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |