MS SB2438 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 37-9-13 And 37-9-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Appointment Of All Superintendents Of Schools From And After January 1, 2019; To Repeal Effective July 1, 2019, Sections 37-5-61, 37-5-63, 37-5-65, 37-5-67, 37-5-69, 37-5-71 And 37-5-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For Elected County Superintendents Of Education, Changing The Position Of County Superintendent Of Education To An Appointed Office Pursuant To Petition And Referendum, Provide For The Reestablishment Of The Office As An Elective Office, Authorize The Appointment Of The County Superintendent Of Education In Certain Counties, Provide For The Selection And Qualifications Of Elected Superintendents In Certain Counties, Provide For The Filling Of Vacancies In The Office Of Elected County Superintendent Of Education, And Section 37-9-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For A Referendum On The Question Of Retaining The Elective Method Of Choosing The County Superintendent Of Education; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Local school superintendents; all appointed after January 1, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-24 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Moore, Roberson) |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Education |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Education |