MS SB2434 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-3-1213, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create A Rebuttable Presumption That Manually Texting While Driving Constitutes Careless Driving; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Texting while driving; constitutes careless driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 91 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2014-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Johnson,Bailey,Ladner |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Doty,Hudson |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-27 | House | Amended |
2014-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Transportation |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |