MS SB2427 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 81-22-1, 81-22-3, 81-22-5, 81-22-7, 81-22-9, 81-22-11, 81-22-13, 81-22-15, 81-22-17, 81-22-19, 81-22-21, 81-22-23, 81-22-25, 81-22-27 And 81-22-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Are Known And Cited As The "mississippi Debt Management Services Act"; To Amend Reenacted Section 81-22-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Inform The Code Publisher Of Certain Nonsubstantive Language That Should Be Revised; To Reenact And Amend Section 81-22-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On Those Sections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Debt Management Services Act; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-04 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-02-19 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-02-18 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-18 | Amended | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Banking and Financial Services | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-01-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |