MS SB2415 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 37-151-1, 37-151-5, 37-151-6, 37-151-7, 37-151-7.1, 37-151-8, 37-151-9, 37-151-10, 37-151-11, 37-151-13, 37-151-25, 37-151-59, 37-151-61, 37-151-63, 37-151-65, 37-151-67, 37-151-75, 37-151-77, 37-151-79, 37-151-81, 37-151-83, 37-151-85, 37-151-87, 37-151-89, 37-151-91, 37-151-93, 37-151-95, 37-151-97, 37-151-99, 37-151-101, 37-151-103, 37-151-105 And 37-151-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Mississippi Adequate Education Program, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Adequate Education Program; bring forward statutes for possible amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-26 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 151 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 59 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 77 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 79 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 83 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 89 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 97 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 151 | 99 | New Code | See Bill Text |