MS SB2404 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 49-17-403 And 49-17-421, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Relating To The Mississippi Underground Storage Tank Regulatory Act, To Include Certain Underground Storage Tanks Within The Definition Of An Active Site, To Revise The Manner In Which The Underground Storage Tank Regulatory Fee Is Determined, And To Require The Mississippi Commission On Environmental Quality To Consider The Report From The Underground Storage Tank Advisory Council And Any Public Comments When Setting The Annual Storage Tank Fee; To Create New Section 49-17-422, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Underground Storage Tank Advisory Council; To Require The Advisory Council To Conduct An Independent Study Of The Costs Related To The Underground Storage Tank Program; To Require The Advisory Council To Recommend An Equitable Fee System For The Storage Tank Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Underground Storage Tank regulatory law; provide criteria for annual storage tank fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: WM To CR |
2018-02-22 | House | DR - TSDPAA: CR To WM |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources;Ways and Means |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Energy |