MS SB2400 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-61-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow County Coroners To Contract With A Private Pathologist To Perform Autopsies On A Pilot-program Basis; To Amend Section 41-61-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
County coroners; may contract with a private pathologist to perform autopsies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Died On Calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Cockerham, Baker, Tullos) |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the Third Time |
2019-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Amended |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |