MS SB2400 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 55-15-51 Through 55-15-62, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Mississippi Veterans Monument Commission; To Amend Section 55-15-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Mississippi Veterans Monument Commission; To Designate The Mississippi Military Department's Armed Forces Museum As Mississippi's Official State Military History Museum; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Veterans Monument Commission; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Ezell Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Died On Calendar | |
2010-02-18 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Military Affairs | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-03 | Amended | |
2010-01-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs |