MS SB2396 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide Liability Protections For Refiners, Suppliers, Wholesalers And Retailers From Damages Caused By The Use Of Incompatible Motor Fuel Dispensed At A Retail Site Upon Certain Conditions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor fuel sales; provide immunity for damages caused by the use of incompatible fuel upon certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EN To JA |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Energy;Judiciary, Division A |