MS SB2379 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 1-1-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That In Order To Receive Physical, Bound Volumes Of The Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Authorized, Requires The Recipient To Elect In Writing To The Receipt; To Amend Section 1-1-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Right Of A Successor In Office To Opt-in To Receiving Physical, Bound Volumes Of The Code To Include Subsequent Periodic Updates; To Amend Section 1-1-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Joint Code Committee's Authority To Contract With A Publisher To Provide Electronic Access To The Code; To Bring Forward Section 1-1-57, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 1-1-60, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Repeal Section 1-1-58, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For Publication And Distribution Of The Advance Sheets Of The General Laws Enacted At Each Session Of The Legislature; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Code books; revise number required to be ordered from publisher.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2023-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Reynolds,Watson |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Boyd,Turner-Ford |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-02-24 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-23 | House | Amended |
2023-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 1 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 1 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 1 | 58 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 1 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 1 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |