MS SB2375 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-13-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create A Category Of Special General Guardian To Oversee The Person And Affairs Of Certain Minors; To Amend Sections 93-13-55, 93-13-57, 93-13-67 And 93-13-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform And To Provide For Waiver Of Annual Accountings And Final Accountings And Closure Of Guardianship Files In Certain Circumstances; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Guardianships; attorney and accounting not required under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-05 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Gipson, Baker, Reynolds) |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed |
2013-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |