MS SB2365 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-11-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Value Of Any Maintenance Furnished To Members Of The Public Employees' Retirement System That Is Not Paid In Money Shall Not Be Included In The Earned Compensation Of The Members For Retirement Purposes; To Provide Certain Exceptions To This Provision For Employees Who Were Receiving Maintenance Before July 1, 2010; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Retirement; exclude value of noncash maintenance furnished to PERS members for retirement purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Amended | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-28 | DR - TSDP: FS To FI | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Fees, Salaries and Administration;Finance |