MS SB2362 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-19-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Child Support Guidelines Are Presumed To Be Reasonable For Adjusted Gross Income Within A Certain Income Range; To Amend Section 43-19-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Payment Of Child Care Expenses By The Obligee Overcomes The Presumption That Child Support Guidelines Are Appropriate; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child support guidelines; presumed to be reasonable for adjusted gross income within a certain range.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-14 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Amended | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | DR - TSDP: PH To JA | |
2012-02-13 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Judiciary, Division A |