MS SB2337 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-629, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Application For An Absentee Ballot Of A Person Who Is Temporarily Physically Disabled To Be Accompanied By A Statement Signed By A Physician Or Nurse Practitioner Indicating That The Person Applying For The Absentee Ballot Is Temporarily Physically Disabled To Such A Degree That It Is Difficult For Him To Vote In Person Or His Attendance At The Voting Place Could Reasonably Cause Danger To Himself Or Others; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Absentee ballots; require application of temporarily disabled to be accompanied by a statement from a doctor or nurse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Apportionment and Elections | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed | |
2010-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Elections |