MS SB2335 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-73-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow An Income Tax Credit For An Employer Making Direct Payments To A Licensed Or Registered Entity For Dependent Care In The Name Of And For The Benefit Of An Employee Residing In Mississippi; To Specify That, In The Case Of Dependent Care Facilities Operated By An Employer Or Contracting With An Employer, The Existing Credit Applies When Those Facilities Are Located In The State Of Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax credit; allow for employer making direct payments to entity for dependent care on behalf of employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-26 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill |
2023-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Powell |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Parker,Boyd,Younger |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-03 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-02 | House | Amended |
2023-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-24 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EC To FI |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Economic and Workforce Development;Finance |