MS SB2331 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-940, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal To July 3, 2017 On The Drug And Alcohol Treatment Program Operated At The Bolivar County Regional Facility; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bolivar County Regional Facility; extend date of repeal on drug and alcohol treatment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-03-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Taylor, Huddleston (30th)) |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Corrections |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |