MS SB2324 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 75-24-351 Through 75-24-357, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Prohibit Bad Faith Assertions Of Patent Infringement And Establish Remedies For Prevailing Plaintiffs In Civil Actions Instituted Under The Provisions; To Amend Reenacted Section 75-24-359, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Reenacted Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bad Faith Assertions of Patent Infringement; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 24 | 351 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 24 | 353 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 24 | 355 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 24 | 357 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 24 | 359 | New Code | See Bill Text |