MS SB2309 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize And Require Local Governmental Entities To Transmit Land Use Plans And Proposals To The Mississippi Military Installation Located Within Its Jurisdiction For Review And Comment On The Effect Of The Proposal On Its Mission; To Provide That A Representative Of The Affected Military Installation Shall Serve As An Ex Officio Nonvoting Member Of The Appropriate Local Planning Or Zoning Board To Exchange Information In Order To Encourage Compatible Land Use, Prevent Incompatible Encroachment And Facilitate The Continued Presence Of Major Military Installations In This State; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Compatibility of land use development with Mississippi military installations; require exchange of information.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott DeLano [R] | Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] | Sen. Charles Younger [R] | Sen. Philip Moran [R] |
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Municipalities;Military Affairs |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs |