MS SB2307 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-3-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Provision Of Law Establishing The Compensation Of Elected State And District Officers; To Bring Forward Section 25-3-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Compensation of elected state & district officers; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred To State Affairs |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 3 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text |