MS SB2306 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-813, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer The Authority Of The Mississippi Ethics Commission To Assess A Civil Penalty Against Any Candidate Or Political Committee For Failure To File A Report To The Secretary Of State; To Delete The Provisions That Provides For A Hearing For A Candidate Or Political Committee Before The State Board Of Election Commissioners; To Provide For An Appeal Procedure For Those Candidates Who Are Assessed A Civil Penalty By The Secretary Of State; To Amend Section 23-15-807, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That For Reports That Would Otherwise Be Due On A Weekend Or Legal Holiday Shall Be Due On The Next Working Day After The Due Date; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Campaign finance reports; amend provisions relating to.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Vetoed | |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Beckett,Eubanks,Newman |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Tate,Blount,Blackwell |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | House | Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 813 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |