MS SB2282 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 53-11-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Legislative Findings Regarding Geologic Sequestration Of Carbon Dioxide; To Amend Section 53-11-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of Reservoir; To Amend Section 53-11-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The State Oil And Gas Board's Authority When Entering An Order Approving A Geologic Sequestration Facility; To Provide For A Method For The Board To Enter An Order Approving Any Proposed Geologic Sequestration Of Carbon Dioxide When A Majority Interest Has Not Consented; To Amend Section 53-11-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For A Method For The Board To Enter An Order Approving Any Proposed Geologic Sequestration Of Carbon Dioxide When A Majority Interest Has Not Consented; To Amend Section 53-11-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of Interested Person Regarding Appeals To Chancery Court; To Amend Section 11-27-47, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Eminent Domain Laws For Pipelines And Appliances To Grant The Right Of Eminent Domain To Entities For The Purpose Of Transporting Or Conveying Carbon Dioxide And Other Gaseous Substances In Connection With The Geologic Sequestration Of Carbon Dioxide And Other Gaseous Substances And Any Associated Carbon Capture And Geologic Sequestration Facility Projects; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Carbon dioxide geologic sequestration; revise laws regarding.
Sponsors
Sen. Joel Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 24 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Failed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 27 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 11 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 11 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 11 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 11 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |