MS SB2245 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-37-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Law Enforcement To Purchase Equipment With The Proceeds Of The Sale Of Forfeited Weapons; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sale of seized weapons; authorize use of proceeds to purchase equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |