MS SB2238 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit The Division Of Medicaid From Authorizing Payment Of Part Or All Of The Costs Of Care And Services Rendered By Any Entity That Performs Nontherapeutic Abortions, Maintains Or Operates A Facility Where Nontherapeutic Abortions Are Performed, Or Is Affiliated With Such An Entity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Abortion services; prohibit Division of Medicaid from reimbursing Planned Parenthood Federation of America (PPFA).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 81 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 77 N: 37 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 81 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 77 N: 37 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-16 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-13 | House | Conferees Named Brown,Hood,Bennett |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Burton,Caughman |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Clarke, Brown, Bomgar, Wooten) |
2016-03-29 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-29 | House | Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-22 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To ME |
2016-03-17 | House | DR - TSDPAA: ME To AP |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Medicaid;Appropriations |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-16 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: ME To AP |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Medicaid;Appropriations |