MS SB2231 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-7-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Constables To Receive The Uniform Fee When The Defendant Cannot Be Found After Two Documented Actual Attempts To Serve The Process; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Constables; allow fee for attempt to serve the process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Died In Conference |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Carpenter,Chism,Rogers (14th) |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Collins,Polk,Fillingane |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-02-27 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-02-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-02-26 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Baria, Carpenter, Straughter) |
2015-02-26 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Fees and Salaries of Public Officers |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |