MS SB2208 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact The Mississippi Aboveground Storage Tank Act Of 2013; To Provide Definitions For The Act; To Provide That Funds Should Be Expended From The Mississippi Groundwater Protection Trust Fund For Certain Purposes Of The Act; To Authorize The Mississippi Commission On Environmental Quality To Establish Requirements For Reports On Contamination Incidents; To Direct The Commission To Promulgate Rules And Regulations Governing Aboveground Storage Tanks; To Provide Certain Obligations Of Owners And Operators Of Aboveground Storage Tanks; To Authorize The Commission To Take Timely And Effective Corrective Action In Using The Pollution Emergency Fund; To Authorize The Commission To Assess And Collect A Tank Regulatory Fee To Use For The Administration Of This Act; To Establish The Aboveground Storage Tank Advisory Council; To Provide A Civil Penalty For Violations Of This Act; To Amend Section 49-17-405, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Aboveground Storage Tank Act of 2013; enact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources;Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EP To AP |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Environment Prot, Cons and Water Res;Appropriations |