MS SB2204 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-15-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Provision Providing For The Payment Of Premiums Under The State And School Employees Health Insurance Plan; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Employees Health Insurance Plan; extend repealer on provision providing for the payment of premiums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Died On Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |