MS SB2181 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-17-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Crime Of Theft Of Livestock; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Agricultural crimes; revise crime of livestock theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred To Agriculture;Judiciary B |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Amended |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture |