MS SB2167 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-297, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Independent And Special Election Candidates To Pay Qualifying Fees And To Revise The Qualifying Fees For Certain Offices; To Amend Section 23-15-299, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish The Deadline For Independent And Special Election Candidates To Pay Their Assessment Fees And To Whom Such Fees Must Be Paid; To Amend Section 23-15-359, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require A Party Nominee Or Independent Candidate For The Office Of President Of The United States To Pay An Assessment In Order To Be Included On The General Election Ballot; To Amend Section 23-15-1093, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Qualifying Fee For Candidates For President Of The United States; To Amend Sections 23-15-1089 And 23-15-1091, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Bring Forward Sections 23-15-309 And 23-15-361, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Qualifying fees; require independent candidates to pay and increase for party candidates.
Sponsors
Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Philip Moran [R] | Sen. Sally Doty [R] |
Sen. Charles Younger [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Denny, Reynolds) |
2016-03-25 | House | Passed |
2016-03-25 | House | Amendment Failed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amended |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-18 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: EL To AC |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |