MS SB2153 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create Section 75-24-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Persons Or Entities Engaged In The Rental Of Motor Vehicles To Disclose The Total Charges For The Entity Rental, Including All Additional Mandatory Charges; To Amend Section 75-24-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Transportation; require disclosure of the total charges in the rental of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |