MS SB2149 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation To Defray The Expenses Of The Department Of Finance And Administration For Fiscal Year 2020 For The 2020 Census.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; additional appropriation to Department of Finance & Administration for the 2020 Census.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10 Approved by Governor
2020-02-04HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-02-04SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-02-03HouseReturned For Enrolling
2020-01-30HouseImmediate Release
2020-01-30HousePassed
2020-01-29HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-01-28HouseReferred To Appropriations
2020-01-28SenateTransmitted To House
2020-01-28SenateImmediate Release
2020-01-28SenatePassed
2020-01-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-01-24SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback