MS SB2142 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate The American Quarter Horse As The "official State Horse Of The State Of Mississippi"; To Designate The Kemp's Ridley Sea Turtle As The "official Sea Turtle Of The State Of Mississippi"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Designate American Quarter Horse as the Official State Horse and Kemp's Ridley sea turtle as Official Sea Turtle of Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-09 | House | Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To State Affairs |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Tourism |