MS SB2141 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Veto Referred To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Veto Referred To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A Task Force To Conduct A Study Of The Selection And Governance Structure Of Local School Boards In Mississippi; To Provide For A Report To The 2014 Regular Session Of The Legislature; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Local school boards in Mississippi; create task force to study structure of.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 66 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | Veto Referred To Education |
2013-03-18 | Vetoed | |
2013-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | Passed |
2013-03-05 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Education |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Education |