MS SB2120 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-1-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Salaries Of All Officers Of The Mississippi Highway Safety Patrol And The Mississippi Bureau Of Narcotics; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Public Safety; revise salaries of officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,Cockerham |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Blackwell,Thompson |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |