MS SB2120 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create Section 41-9-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Flu Vaccinations To Be Offered By Hospitals To Certain Patients Prior To Discharge; To Amend Section 41-9-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Flu vaccinations; require hospital to offer to patients prior to discharge.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Died In Committee |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Motion to Recommit Lost |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |