MS SB2098 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Reenact Sections 73-11-41 Through 73-11-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The State Board Of Funeral Service And Prescribe Its Duties And Powers; To Reenact Section 73-11-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Establishes Requirements Relating To The Removal Of Dead Bodies By Funeral Establishments; To Amend Section 73-11-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repeal Date On Sections Of Law Which Create The State Board Of Funeral Service And Prescribe Its Duties And Powers; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Funeral Service; extend repealer on.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11 Approved by Governor
2021-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-05SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-04HouseReturned For Enrolling
2021-03-03HousePassed
2021-03-01HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2021-02-05SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-04SenatePassed
2021-01-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-07SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
731133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
731141Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731143Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731145Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731147Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731149Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731151Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731153Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731155Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731156Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731157Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731158Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731159Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731161Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731163Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731165Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731167Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731169Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731171Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
731173Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback