MS SB2090 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Mississippi Book Festival; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Distinctive motor vehicle license tags; authorize for Mississippi Book Festival.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Finance |