MS SB2066 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 21-17-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Governing Authority Of A Municipality To Enter Into An Agreement With A Housing Authority To Provide Extra Police Protection To The Housing Authority In Exchange For The Payment Of Compensation Or A Fee To The Municipality; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipalities; extend repeal date on authority to enter agreements to provide extra police protection to housing authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2014-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Municipalities |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Municipalities |