MS SB2040 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 9-11-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Justice Courts To Designate At Least One Day A Month As Traffic Court Day; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Justice court; required to set separate traffic court term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Amended | |
2010-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-06 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |