MS SB2035 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-7-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commission On Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Declare Special Seasons, Within Or Outside The Established Open Seasons, For Collecting Chronic Wasting Disease Testing Samples; To Establish Air Guns, Air Bows And Pre-charged Pneumatic Weapons As Lawful Means Of Hunting Game; To Authorize The Commission To Define Air Guns, Air Bows And Pre-charged Pneumatic Weapons Suitable For Hunting Game; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hunting; allow air guns, air bows and pre-charged pneumatic weapons, and authorize special seasons for CWD sample collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2021-03-28 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2021-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Kinkade,Barnett,Bounds |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Conferees Named Whaley,Suber,Blackwell |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Kinkade, Barnett, Hobgood-Wilkes) |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |