MS SB2033 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-931, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Incarcerate Additional Offenders At County And Regional Correctional Facilities; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MDOC; may incarcerate additional offenders in county and regional correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-12 | House | Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2014-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-04 | House | DR - TSDP: CN To JB |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Corrections;Judiciary B |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDP: CR To AP |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Corrections;Appropriations |