MS SB2031 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 907, Local And Private Laws Of 2013, As Reenacted And Amended By Chapter 926, Local And Private Laws Of 2017, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Law That Authorizes The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Louisville, Mississippi, To Impose A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Room Rentals For Hotels Or Motels In The City And To Establish A Tourism And Economic Advisory Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Louisville; extend the hotel and motel tax repeal date to July 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed |
2021-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |