MS SB2023 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-11-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "adult Day Care Facility" For Purposes Of Institutional Licensure By The State Department Of Health; To Amend Section 43-11-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Direct The State Board Of Health To Promulgate Rules, Regulations And Standards Regarding The Operation Of Adult Day Care Facilities Which Incorporate The Most Current Ranges And Levels Of Care Developed By The National Adult Day Services Association (nadsa); To Codify Section 43-11-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe Fees For Adult Day Care Facility Licensure; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Adult care facilities; define adult day care facilities for licensure purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-29 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: PH To AP |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations |