MS HR88 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending Sharkey County On The Occasion Of Its "recover, Reconnect And Rebuild" Event That Commemorates The Recovery Efforts Of Sharkey County Residents And Honors The Lives Of Those Lost During The March 2023, Tornadoes And Thunderstorms.
Title
"Recover Reconnect and Rebuild"; commend Sharkey County on occasion of and honor the lives of those lost during the March 2023 storms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2024-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Rules |