MS HR77 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Dedicated Service And Distinguished Career Accomplishments Of Mr. Sammy Houston Ainsworth And Congratulating Him Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Mr. Sammy H. Ainsworth; commend dedicated service and career upon his retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-29 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-29 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred To Rules |