MS HR62 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Recognizing The Pineywoods Cattle, The Colonial Spanish/pine Tacky Horse And The Gulf Coast Native Sheep As The Official Heritage Breeds Of Cattle, Horse And Sheep, Respectively.
Title
Pineywoods cattle, Colonial Spanish/Pine Tacky horse and Gulf Coast Native sheep; recognize as official heritage breeds in Mississippi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-25 | House | Passed |
2017-03-25 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Title Suff Adopted Comm Sub |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred To Rules |