MS HR53 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Distinguished Career And Meritorious Leadership And Service That Kenneth E. Brawner Provided As The Alcorn County Tax Assessor Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Kenneth Brawner; commend upon retirement as Alcorn County Tax Assessor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-04 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred To Rules |