MS HR52 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending Dr. Chandra M. Minor, Dmd, For Being The First African-american Female Orthodontist In Mississippi.
Title
Chandra M. Minor, DMD; commend for being the first African-American female orthodontist in Mississippi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-15 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred To Rules |